CT HB07368 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 942
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 942
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make a technical correction.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Mass Appraisal Software.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 942 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 541 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8812 |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 705 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 441 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |