CT HB07367 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 407
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the use of the Penfield Reef Lighthouse as a columbarium for the cremated remains of deceased persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of The Penfield Reef Lighthouse As A Columbarium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 407
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 704
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 440
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback