CT HB07367 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 407
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 407
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the use of the Penfield Reef Lighthouse as a columbarium for the cremated remains of deceased persons.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of The Penfield Reef Lighthouse As A Columbarium.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D] | Rep. Andre Baker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 407 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 704 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 440 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |