CT HB07356 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow school districts to use school security infrastructure competitive grant program funds to hire school security officers, to establish a task force to study issues concerning the authorization of school security officers to carry a firearm while on duty, and to revise the school safety infrastructure criteria for school building projects to include doors that can be locked from inside the classroom.
Title
An Act Concerning School Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 626 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 379 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |