CT HB07346 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the use of the organophosphate pesticide chlorpyrifos.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Certain Organophosphates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-01HouseNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-23HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-11HouseFile Number 621
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 375
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback