CT HB07325 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To transfer the authority for receiving state marshals' statements of income from the Office of State Ethics to the State Marshal Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning State Marshals And Statements Of Financial Interests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 395 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-180
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-09HouseFile Number 869
2019-05-09HouseSenate Calendar Number 469
2019-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8032
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 700
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 436
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback