CT HB07323 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making Deficiency Appropriations For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017.
Title
An Act Making Deficiency Appropriations For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] |
Sen. Robert Duff [D] | Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 243 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Special Act 17-3 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 546 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | House Passed |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | Emergency Certification |