CT HB07321 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require the Secretary of the State to appoint an individual to serve in the office of the Secretary of the State in a cyber security role, (2) limit, in certain situations, the type of information provided when voter registration records are provided, (3) require that each voting tabulator has two memory cards programmed for use with such tabulator, (4) provide for security analysis of such memory cards by The University of Connecticut, and (5) provide that signers of petitions are not required to disclose their dates of birth on such petitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Elections And Security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 697
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 433
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback