CT HB07317 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To promote urban and rural workforce development.
Title
An Act Concerning Urban And Rural Workforce Development.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Joshua Hall [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] |
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 433 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 285 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |