CT HB07315 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 783
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide a judicial mechanism for the resolution of complaints made against sextons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Adjudication Of Complaints Made Against Sextons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 783
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 491
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback