CT HB07308 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 868
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioners of Economic and Community Development and Administrative Services to develop a plan to implement the recommendations of the telecommunications systems steering committee's recommendations concerning the development of a one-stop electronic business portal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Review Of Agency Procedures, Policies And Regulations Concerning Business Registration, Licensing And Permitting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 72 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseFile Number 868
2019-05-09HouseSenate Calendar Number 467
2019-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8042
2019-04-01HouseFile Number 254
2019-04-01HouseHouse Calendar Number 172
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback