CT HB07306 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to develop a plan to implement recommendations from the speaker of the House of Representative's Blue Ribbon Commission on Tourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Recommendations From The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives' Blue Ribbon Commission On Tourism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 365 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 182 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-178
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 995
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 597
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9262
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 355
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 233
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback