CT HB07305 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study the needs of manufacturers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Manufacturer Needs In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback