CT HB07304 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - File Number 252
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - File Number 252
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study economic development issues in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 252 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |