CT HB07299 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To modify existing Department of Consumer Protection enforcement statutes.
Title
An Act Making Changes To Department Of Consumer Protection Enforcement Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-177 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2019-05-31 | House | File Number 1026 |
2019-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 645 |
2019-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2019-05-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 9897 |
2019-05-28 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-28 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 7113 |
2019-05-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8790 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 498 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 325 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |