CT HB07297 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify statutes concerning animal quarantine and disposal orders issued after a dog or other animal bites or attacks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Quarantine And Disposal Orders Of Animal Control Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 366 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 386 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-197
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 698
2019-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10222
2019-04-11HouseFile Number 619
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 373
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback