CT HB07296 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit municipalities to authorize and issue municipal employees' retirement system pension funding bonds.
Title
An Act Authorizing The Funding Of Unfunded Accrued Municipal Employees' Retirement System Liabilities By Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 324 PASS (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 118 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 118 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-16 | House | Public Act 17-107 |
2017-06-06 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-11 | House | File Number 754 |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 441 |
2017-05-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6676 |
2017-04-12 | House | File Number 560 |
2017-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 373 |
2017-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |