CT HB07295 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 654
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 654
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the establishment of a producer-financed recycling program for packaging and paper in the state and to require certain solid waste reduction goals of municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Recycling Plans For Paper And Packaging And Establishing Certain Municipal Solid Waste Management Goals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | File Number 654 |
2019-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 399 |
2019-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |