CT HB07294 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 665
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the bottle bill in order to increase handling fees, redistribute escheats from unredeemed bottles, include additional beverage containers in the redemption value requirement, encourage additional independent redemption centers, increase the redemption value of such containers and establish a goal for the recycling of such containers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Bottle Redemption In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 665
2019-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-01SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10256
2019-05-02HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-02HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 561
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 343
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback