CT HB07283 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the State to enhance the CONCORD commercial records database by allowing a member of the public to ascertain the name and address of a business entity's agent for service of process by entering the name of the owner of such business entity in the database.
Title
An Act Concerning Improved Public Access To Certain Business Records Filed With The Secretary Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-20 | House | File Number 662 |
2017-04-20 | House | House Calendar Number 427 |
2017-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |