CT HB07280 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Commissioner of Transportation to submit a tolling proposal to the General Assembly; and (2) create the Connecticut Transportation Finance Authority.
Title
An Act Concerning Support For Transportation Infrastructure And The Creation Of The Connecticut Transportation Finance Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 490 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 317 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |