CT HB07280 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 610
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 610
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make a minor and technical change to a statute concerning the Secretary of the State.
Title
An Act Concerning The Secretary Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 610 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8652 |
2017-04-13 | House | File Number 600 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 402 |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |