CT HB07277 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permit municipalities to establish land bank authorities for the purposes of acquiring real property, maintaining any such real property and disposing of any such real property within such municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Creation Of Land Bank Authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 363 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 159 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-175
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseFile Number 969
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 587
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9096
2019-04-11HouseFile Number 616
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 370
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback