CT HB07273 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to conduct a study regarding student internships and student teaching in college environments.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Internships And Student Teaching In College Environments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 354 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 232 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |