CT HB07271 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 418
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To adopt the Uniform Real Estate Receivership Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 418
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 489
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 316
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback