CT HB07271 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Technical High School System as an independent state agency.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of The Technical High School System As An Independent Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 372 PASS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 325 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 325 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-26 | House | Public Act 17-237 |
2017-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 591 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8534 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | File Number 555 |
2017-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 370 |
2017-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |