CT HB07267 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 676
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Establish the ConnectHealth Program, the ConnectHealth Trust Account and the ConnectHealth Advisory Board; (2) require the Comptroller, in consultation with the ConnectHealth Advisory Board and the Office of Health Strategy, to establish the ConnectHealth Plan; (3) modify requirements concerning nonstate public employer enrollment in the state employee plan; (4) expand the variety of plans offered by the Comptroller to nonstate public employers; and (5) authorize the Comptroller to offer coverage to small employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Public Options For Health Care In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 285 AS AMENDED (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 676
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10326
2019-05-03HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-03HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-24HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 353
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 231
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback