CT HB07262 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Connecticut Sentencing Commission concerning victim notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Connecticut Sentencing Commission With Respect To Victim Notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 378 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 99 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-22HousePublic Act 17-217
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed
2017-05-05HouseSenate Calendar Number 419
2017-05-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-03HouseHouse Passed
2017-04-18HouseFile Number 640
2017-04-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 411
2017-04-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM
2017-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-04HouseJoint Favorable
2017-03-20HousePublic Hearing 03/24
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback