CT HB07260 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 298
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 298
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exclude beer manufacturers, their employees and the dependents of their employees from various provisions of the insurance statutes concerning small employer health insurance coverage.
Title
An Act Excluding Beer Manufacturers, Their Employees And The Dependents Of Their Employees From Various Provisions Of The Insurance Statutes Concerning Small Employer Health Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 298 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 206 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |