CT HB07258 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit boards of education to establish and maintain a firm graduation date and to begin school sessions after the Labor Day holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Establishment Of A Firm Graduation Date And The Date When A School District May Commence School Sessions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 372 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 699
2019-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9008
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 297
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 205
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback