CT HB07257 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To collect data and review policies regarding food-insecure students at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Food-insecure Students At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 358 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-22HouseFile Number 769
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 375
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-17HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7038
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 296
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 204
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback