CT HB07256 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide notification to the state's attorney of the death of an individual in the care or custody of a state agency or department; to refine the law protecting health care workers from on-the-job violence; to correct oversights in public act 16-148; to address the issue raised in State v. Apt., 319 Conn. 494 (2015) concerning the disclosure of erased records, to make such disclosure mandatory, and to make such disclosure available for use in connection with collateral matters in which evidence of a nolled or dismissed criminal charge may become relevant when the petitioner challenges the validity of a guilty plea.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Certain Criminal Justice Statutes And The Reporting Of The Death Of Any Person In State Custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Public Act 17-216 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | File Number 816 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 557 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8078 |
2017-04-18 | House | File Number 638 |
2017-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 409 |
2017-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |