CT HB07254 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require teachers applying for professional certification with a comprehensive special education or integrated early childhood and special education endorsement to complete a program of study in the diagnosis and remediation of reading and language arts that includes supervised practicum hours and instruction in the detection and recognition of, and evidence-based structured literacy interventions for, students with dyslexia.
Title
An Act Requiring Special Education Teachers To Complete A Program Of Study In Evidence-based Structured Literacy Interventions For Students With Dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 106 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-05-08 | House | Public Act 17-3 |
2017-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 365 |
2017-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 462 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 323 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |