CT HB07250 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require school districts and preschool program providers to include at least fifty minutes of undirected play during each day in order to develop children's social skills, physical development and emotional well-being.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Additional Time Devoted To Undirected Play To The Regular School Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 171 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseFile Number 983
2019-05-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 590
2019-05-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-21HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9102
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 295
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 203
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback