CT HB07246 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 690
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify the Governor's authority with respect to the command and control of the Connecticut State Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Organization Of The Connecticut State Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 339 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 690
2019-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 152
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 116
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback