CT HB07245 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow nonresident members of the armed forces who are the parents or guardians of nonresident students to enroll such students in certain schools in anticipation of moving to and residing in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Advance Enrollment Of Students In Charter Schools And Interdistrict Magnet Schools By Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 201 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 151 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |