CT HB07238 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the statutes concerning the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Commissioner Of Emergency Services And Public Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 296 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-08 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-08 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-07 | House | Public Act 17-58 |
2017-06-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-02 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Senate Calendar Number 453 |
2017-05-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 295 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 225 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |