CT HB07235 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide audio access by blind or visually impaired persons to government web sites and public safety notices.
Title
An Act Concerning Access By Blind And Visually Impaired Persons To Public Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 350 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 228 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |