CT HB07229 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) authorize the creation of Connecticut brownfield land banks for the purpose of acquiring, remediating and selling brownfields on behalf of municipalities, (2) make revisions concerning lender liability and verifications for portions of properties under the brownfield remediation and revitalization program, and (3) provide funding for brownfield remediation and development projects.
Title
An Act Concerning The Creation Of Connecticut Brownfield Land Banks, Revisions To The Brownfield Remediation And Revitalization Program And Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Brownfield Remediation And Development Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | House | Public Act 17-214 |
2017-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-04-17 | House | Senate Calendar Number 343 |
2017-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 461 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 322 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |