CT HB07226 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To change the annual amount available for matching grants under the arts endowment fund to four per cent of the average value of the fund over the most recent four years.
Title
An Act Concerning Awards From The Connecticut Arts Endowment Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 440 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Public Act 17-213 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 553 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-09 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-04-05 | House | File Number 431 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 304 |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |