CT HB07225 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow housing authorities to implement a hybrid waiting list management system in order to streamline the application process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Public Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 355 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 42 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-168
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 812
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 405
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7263
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 197
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 147
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback