CT HB07222 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - File Number 911
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify the Attorney General's authority to (1) investigate allegations that an individual's civil rights are being violated, and (2) initiate legal proceedings in response to such allegations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Duties Of The Office Of The Attorney General.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseFile Number 911
2019-05-17HouseSenate Calendar Number 523
2019-05-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-15HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8794
2019-04-29HouseFile Number 826
2019-04-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 526
2019-04-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-11HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback