CT HB07221 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide access to information that is needed for water planning purposes while adhering to prudent security considerations.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Water Planning Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 458 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 459 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 459 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | House | Public Act 17-211 |
2017-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | House | File Number 804 |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 539 |
2017-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7465 |
2017-04-13 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 460 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 321 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |