CT HB07220 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding safe drinking water.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Safe Drinking Water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 586 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6199 |
2017-04-13 | House | File Number 593 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 395 |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |