CT HB07219 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to conduct a study regarding municipal development.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |