CT HB07217 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal obsolete statutes concerning the Department of Correction.
Title
An Act Concerning The Release Of Inmates Suffering From Opioid Use Disorder And Repealing Obsolete Department Of Correction Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 419 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-167 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | House | File Number 1006 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 623 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9546 |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 428 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 280 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |