CT HB07215 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require local and regional boards of education to develop safe school climate policies, (2) require schools to assess school climate, (3) require the Department of Education to develop a social and emotional learning assessment instrument, (4) establish the duties of a safe school climate coordinator, (5) require local and regional boards of education to establish a social and emotional learning and school climate council in place of the existing safe school climate committee, (6) require the Department of Education to develop a model safe school climate policy, and (7) require local and regional boards of education to provide training on the prevention of and intervention in discrimination against and targeted harassment of students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning School Climates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-166
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31HouseFile Number 1025
2019-05-31HouseSenate Calendar Number 640
2019-05-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-29HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-29HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9992
2019-05-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-16HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Education
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 126
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 104
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback