CT HB07209 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create the Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority.
Title
An Act Establishing The Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 212 AS AMENDED (Y: 81 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | File Number 1005 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 625 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9552 |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 691 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 427 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |