CT HB07208 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the commercial property assessed clean energy program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 430 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-20 | House | Public Act 17-201 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 458 |
2017-05-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-11 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | File Number 357 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 269 |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |