CT HB07206 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 653
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 653
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a property tax exemption for certain renewable energy sources and hydropower facilities.
Title
An Act Expanding The Property Tax Exemption For Certain Renewable Energy Sources And Hydropower Facilities.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Olivia Floren [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 232 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 653 |
2019-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-29 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 690 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 426 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |